FL S0198 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain employees to purchase the retirement credit for past service at a 3 percent Special Risk Class accrual value. Provides requirements for calculating the first 2 percent of a member's average monthly compensation for purposes of purchasing past service credit. Provides that past service credit may be purchased by the member or by the employer on behalf of the member, etc.
Title
Retirement/Special Risk Class [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Carey Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0019 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | In Messages; Died in Messages | |
2010-04-30 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01170; CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 01170 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01003 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00920; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-21 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00703 | |
2010-04-20 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00702; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00703; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-15 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/20/10, 10:30 am, 110-S | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00023 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0049 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S1902 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
H1543 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn from further consideration -HJ 00385
S1902 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
H1543 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn from further consideration -HJ 00385