FL S0196 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the sale or transfer of an assault weapon or large-capacity magazine; specifying circumstances in which the manufacture or transportation of assault weapons or large-capacity magazines is not prohibited; providing enhanced criminal penalties for certain offenses when committed with an assault weapon or large-capacity magazine, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gun Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-08-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H219 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27366Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947146Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback