FL S0194 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to limit the terms of office for a member of a district school board, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitation on Terms of Office for Members of a District School Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01SenateCS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
2018-02-01SenateNow in Education
2018-02-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-30SenateCS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules
2017-08-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1031 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback