FL S0192 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that comprehensive plans and plan amendments that apply to certain lands within or near the Everglades Protection Area follow the state coordinated review process; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection, in consultation with specified entities, to make certain determinations for such plans and amendments, to provide written determinations to the local government and specified entities within a specified timeframe, and to coordinate with the local government and specified entities on certain planning strategies and mitigation measures; authorizing site-specific text changes for small-scale future land use map amendments; requiring local governments whose boundaries include any portion of the Everglades Protection Area to transmit copies of adopted small-scale development amendments to the state land planning agency within a specified timeframe, etc.
Title
Everglades Protection Area
Sponsors
Senate Environment and Natural Resources Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] | Sen. Alexis Calatayud [R] |
Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] | Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2023-04-12 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 2 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Now in Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H175 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |