FL S0190 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning in a specified school year, requiring the Department of Education to annually verify that school districts, charter schools, and specified private schools implement certain instruction relating to the history of African Americans; specifying requirements for school districts, charter schools, and specified private schools relating to such instruction; requiring certain statewide, standardized assessments to include, when appropriate, curricula content from the history of African Americans, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required Instruction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2021-02-03SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-12-15SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-12-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H105 (Similar To) 2021-01-20 - Referred to Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee; Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee
S772 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback