FL S0186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain acts of domestic violence and dating violence; revising a prohibition on the sale or transfer of firearms to persons convicted of misdemeanor domestic violence offenses; prohibiting persons convicted of a misdemeanor offense of domestic violence from possessing a firearm or ammunition; requiring persons convicted of misdemeanor offenses of domestic violence, upon conviction, to surrender all firearms and ammunition in their possession; requiring a law enforcement officer to remove firearms from the scene of an alleged act of domestic violence under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H709 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
784 | 04875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 233 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/186 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/186/BillText/Filed/HTML |