FL S0186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "killing of a victim of mass violence"; expanding an existing exemption from public records requirements for a photograph or a video or audio recording held by an agency which depicts or records the killing of a law enforcement officer to include a photograph or a video or audio recording held by an agency which depicts or records the killing of a victim of mass violence; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Victim of Mass Violence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#330 (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Chapter No. 2019-46
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-02SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-02SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-05-02SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (008047)
2019-05-01SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-01HousePassed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 6
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseAmendment(s) adopted (008047)
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-03HouseIn Messages
2019-03-27SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateAmendment(s) adopted (563584)
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-21SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateAmendment(s) adopted (772026)
2019-03-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/19
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-06SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/06/19, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2019-02-19SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/19/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-12SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-02-11SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H577 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 186 (Ch. 2019-46)
H7017 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 186 (Ch. 2019-46)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
406136Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback