FL S0186 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain institutions to provide each student a specified disclosure statement; requiring the Commission for Independent Education to develop the disclosure statement; revising the commission's evaluation standards for licensure of an institution; requiring the commission to create a Closed Institution Panel by a specified date; requiring the commission to determine whether certain personnel of licensed institutions are qualified and to require certain personnel to complete continuing education and training, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Educational Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Education |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1005 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1005 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/186 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0186/BillText/Filed/HTML |