FL S0184 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Holocaust Education Act of 2020"; requiring charter school instructional personnel to teach specified topics; requiring certain private school instructional personnel to teach specified topics; revising the requirements for instructional content relating to the Holocaust that members of public school instructional staff are required to teach; requiring the Department of Education to coordinate with school districts to appoint Holocaust curriculum coordinators, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holocaust Education in Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-08-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H91 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S1660 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback