FL S0184 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of J.D.S. by the Agency for Persons with Disabilities; providing an appropriation from the General Revenue Fund to compensate J.D.S. for injuries and damages sustained as a result of negligence by the Agency for Persons with Disabilities, as successor agency of the Department of Children and Family Services; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief of J.D.S. by the Agency for Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0177 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Select Committee on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/184 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0184/BillText/Filed/HTML |