FL S0182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Chapter No. 2019-1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Redefining the term "marijuana delivery device" to provide an exception to the requirement that such devices must be purchased from a medical marijuana treatment center for devices that are intended for the medical use of marijuana by smoking; redefining the term "medical use" to include the possession, use, or administration of marijuana in a form for smoking; restricting the smoking of marijuana in enclosed indoor workplaces; requiring a qualified physician to submit specified documentation to the Board of Medicine and the Board of Osteopathic Medicine upon determining that smoking is an appropriate route of administration for a qualified patient, other than a patient diagnosed with a terminal condition, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Use of Marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 101 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Chapter No. 2019-1
2019-03-18 Approved by Governor
2019-03-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-03-13SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-03-13HouseImmediately certified
2019-03-13HouseCS passed; YEAS 101 NAYS 11
2019-03-13HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-13HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-13HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 7015
2019-03-07HouseReceived
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/13/19
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-03-07HouseIn Messages
2019-03-07SenateImmediately certified
2019-03-07SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 4
2019-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (897266)
2019-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-05SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/19
2019-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-02-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-20SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2019-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Received
2019-02-12SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/12/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-06SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-04SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-01-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S372 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
H7015 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 182
S1322 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10044351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381987Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/841422/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/456218/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/815914/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/897266/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/733576/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/264942/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/219464/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/320934/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/299090/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/944380/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Amendment/876992/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Vote/SenateVote_s00182c3007.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/182/Vote/HouseVote_s00182e1004.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback