FL S0180 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing, but not requiring, high schools to offer students opportunities to take specified computer coding courses beginning with a specified school year; requiring the Commissioner of Education to identify such courses that satisfy two credits of sequential foreign language instruction under certain circumstances; requiring each student and his or her parent to sign a specified statement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Computer Coding Instruction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Education; Rules
2017-08-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1213 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1056 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 495
H495 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-150

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10072616Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback