FL S0178 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting state-financed constructors from commencing construction of certain structures in coastal areas after a specified date without first taking certain steps regarding a sea level impact projection study; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to develop by rule a standard for such studies; providing that such rule operates prospectively on projects that have not yet commenced as of the finalization of the rule, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Financing of Construction Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#679 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Chapter No. 2020-119
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-28SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2020-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-12-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-09SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-11-05SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2019-11-04SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-10-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/04/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-08-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H579 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 178 passed
S7016 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H1073 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161551Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback