FL S0176 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting from the sales and use tax specified items that assist in independent living, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Exemption/Items that Assist in Independent Living

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateCS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-20SenateCS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/20/19, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-01-22SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H159 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback