FL S0172 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for appointment of an advocate for the interests of an animal in certain court proceedings, at the discretion of the court; requiring the Animal Law Section of The Florida Bar to maintain a list of attorneys and certified legal interns meeting specified requirements who are eligible to be appointed as such advocates, etc.
Title
Courtroom Animal Advocates
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Agriculture; Rules |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H227 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/172 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/172/BillText/Filed/HTML |