FL S0172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abrogating the future repeal of provisions relating to the Florida Endowment for Vocational Rehabilitation, etc.
Title
Florida Endowment for Vocational Rehabilitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | In Messages |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6001 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
S7062 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7062 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)