FL S0172 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, upon application, to issue a specified license plate to the owners or lessees of motor vehicles who reside in this state and who qualify for two other specified license plates; providing that the license plate entitles the person to specified privileges, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plates for Persons with Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-11-14SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-17SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3200842Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback