FL S0172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, upon application, to issue a specified license plate to the owners or lessees of motor vehicles who reside in this state and who qualify for two other specified license plates; providing that the license plate entitles the person to specified privileges, etc.
Title
License Plates for Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-08-17 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/172 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/172/BillText/Filed/HTML |