FL S0168 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission to establish a pilot program for the eradication of priority invasive species; specifying procedures for the capture and disposal of animals that belong to priority invasive species, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonnative Animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#865 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Chapter No. 2018-82
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 1040
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 145
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseReceived
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-05HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-03-01SenateAmendment(s) adopted (476914)
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-31SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-24SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/18, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
2018-01-09SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/09/18, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-08-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H145 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 168

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3792311Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback