FL S0162 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a health insurer or a health maintenance organization from retroactively denying a claim under specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment of Health Care Claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-03HouseIn Messages
2018-03-03SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Health Policy
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules
2017-08-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H217 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6276131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback