FL S0160 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Now in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from knowingly selling, lending, giving away, distributing, transmitting, showing, or transmuting; offering to commit such actions; having in his or her possession, custody, or control with the intent to commit such actions; or advertising in any manner an obscene, child-like sex doll; providing criminal penalties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited Acts in Connection with Obscene or Lewd Materials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2018-12-17SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
772102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943325Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback