FL S0158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the age of children for whom operators of motor vehicles must provide protection by using a crash-tested, federally approved child restraint device; increasing the age of children for whom a separate carrier, an integrated child seat, or a child booster seat may be used, etc.
Title
Child Restraint Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
Sen. Linda Stewart [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/15/19, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H533 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/158 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/158/BillText/Filed/HTML |