FL S0158 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the permissible activities and projects that may be undertaken, coordinated, or funded by the Florida Communities Trust to include flood mitigation projects; specifying the purpose of flood mitigation projects under the trust; specifying a maximum grant award for such projects; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to establish by rule an application process for such grants, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Communities Trust

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-08-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1097 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
380507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380508Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380510Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback