FL S0154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the scope of a Legislative Auditing Committee review to include compliance with local government fiscal transparency requirements; providing procedures for the Auditor General and local governments to comply with the local government fiscal transparency requirements; revising reporting requirements for certain local government economic development incentives; creating the "Local Government Fiscal Transparency Act"; requiring local governments to post certain voting record information on their websites, etc.
Title
Local Government Fiscal Transparency
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/154 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/154/BillText/Filed/HTML |