FL S0152 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 55
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring Department of Law Enforcement procedures to allow the payment or transmittal of processing fees for criminal history checks of potential firearms buyers by electronic means; providing that criminal history check requests by licensed importers, manufacturers, and dealers to the department may be made by electronic means, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 55
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 55
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-07SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-02-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/18
2018-01-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/18/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 12/07/17, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-09SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-11-09SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-11-07SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/07/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-08-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H55 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-144

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
790065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback