FL S0148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that subjecting any individual, as a condition of employment, membership, certification, licensing, credentialing, or passing an examination, to training, instruction, or any other required activity that espouses, promotes, advances, inculcates, or compels such individual to believe specified concepts constitutes discrimination based on race, color, sex, or national origin; revising the requirements for required instruction on health education; prohibiting instructional materials reviewers from recommending instructional materials that contain any matter that contradicts certain principles, etc.
Title
Individual Freedom
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/18/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Rules |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7 (Similar To) 2022-04-22 - Chapter No. 2022-72
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |