FL S0148 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting a statement of applicability relating to violations of carrying a concealed weapon or firearm; reducing the penalties applicable to a person licensed to carry a concealed weapon or firearm for a first or second violation of specified provisions relating to openly carrying weapons; providing that a person licensed to carry a concealed weapon or firearm does not violate certain provisions if the firearm is temporarily and openly displayed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons and Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-06SenateUnfavorable by Judiciary, laid on Table; YEAS 5 NAYS 5
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-08-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H39 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
790053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback