FL S0144 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying and location information of current or former impaired practitioner consultants retained by an agency or certain current or former employees of an impaired practitioner consultant and the spouses and children of such consultants or employees, under specified circumstances; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Impaired Practitioner Consultants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#181 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-37
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 141
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-01HouseIn Messages
2015-03-24SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-03-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-03-18SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-12SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/15
2015-03-03SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-02-19SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/19/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-02-04SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-02-03SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-01-08SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-01-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-01-06SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2014-12-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/06/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2014-12-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
2014-11-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0141 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 144 (Ch. 2015-37)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback