FL S0140 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a marriage license may not be issued to a person under the age of 18 years except under certain circumstances; requiring parties to a marriage to file a written and signed affidavit with the county court judge or clerk of the circuit court before the judge or clerk may issue a marriage license; requiring each party to a marriage to provide his or her social security number or an alien registration number for purposes of child support enforcement; clarifying that a county court judge or clerk of a circuit court commits a misdemeanor if he or she issues a blank marriage license or if he or she issues a marriage license without obtaining the ages and identification numbers of the parties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#890 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#615 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Chapter No. 2018-81
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 1
2018-03-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s) (756720) 1126
2018-03-05HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-05SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) as amended (923493) 717
2018-03-05SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (756720) 718
2018-02-20SenateIn returning messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 2
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (186227, 951669) 581
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-14HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 335
2018-02-08HouseReceived
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-17SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-01-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-12SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-11SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/11/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-14SenateNow in Rules
2017-11-13SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/06/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-10-30SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2017-10-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-24SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2017-08-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H71 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S208 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
H335 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 140

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7410405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Amendment/765610/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Amendment/186227/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Amendment/951669/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Amendment/923493/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Amendment/756720/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Vote/SenateVote_s00140c2005.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Vote/SenateVote_s00140c2006.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Vote/HouseVote_s00140c2615.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Vote/SenateVote_s00140c2024.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/140/Vote/HouseVote_s00140c2890.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback