FL S0136 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-15 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "qualifying adoptive employee"; providing that certain adoptive veterans and servicemembers are eligible to apply for certain monetary benefits; defining the terms "veteran" and "servicemember", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-11-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 11/13/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-10-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-10-15SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-10-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/15/19, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-09-03SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-08-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H61 (Same As) 2019-11-07 - Now in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4091664Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback