FL S0136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 61
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 61
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "qualifying adoptive employee" and providing for retroactive application; providing that adoptive servicemembers and veterans are eligible to receive certain monetary benefits; requiring servicemembers and veterans seeking a benefit to apply to the Department of Children and Families, etc.
Title
Adoption Benefits
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 61 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 61 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 11/13/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/15/19, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H61 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-22