FL S0136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 7030 (Ch. 2019-22)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding school guardians to the list of officials the false personation of whom is prohibited and is subject to criminal penalties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

False Personation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 7030 (Ch. 2019-22)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-12SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2019-02-11SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2018-12-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7030 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Chapter No. 2019-22

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
84308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback