FL S0136 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution authorizing the Legislature to exempt certain manufacturing equipment from the tangible personal property tax or permitting such equipment to be assessed at less than just value pursuant to an accelerated depreciation method established by general law, and providing an effective date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Exemption and Assessment/Manufacturing Equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-14SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2017-11-14SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-10SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback