FL S0136 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises conditions precedent to the issuance of a license to carry a concealed weapon or firearm. Revises conditions under which a license to carry a concealed weapon or firearm is suspended or revoked and the conditions under which an application for such license is denied or the processing thereof suspended.
Title
Concealed Weapon or Firearm/License to Carry [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Criminal Justice; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00020 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Commerce; Criminal Justice; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |