FL S0134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a concealed weapons or concealed firearms licensee to temporarily surrender a weapon or firearm if the licensee approaches courthouse security or management personnel upon arrival and follows their instructions; defining the term "courthouse"; preempting certain ordinances, rules, orders, and regulations that conflict with that definition or with certain rights, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed Weapons or Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-06SenateUnfavorable by Judiciary, laid on Table; YEAS 4 NAYS 6
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/07/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-08-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H383 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback