FL S0132 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring animal rescue organizations to prepare, maintain, and make available for public inspection and dissemination certain records for a specified period; providing for the sterilization of all dogs and cats sold or released for adoption from animal rescue organizations, subject to certain requirements; providing criminal penalties for specified violations by certain individuals, shelters, organizations, or agencies, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H153 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82829Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback