FL S0118 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a member of the State Legislature to visit any district school, including any charter school, in his or her legislative district, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Visitation of Schools by State Legislators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-23SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-18SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/18/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Rules
2017-12-04SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Education; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H975 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10014205Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback