FL S0116 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring drivers to vacate lanes closest to, or reduce speed and pass, vulnerable road users, authorized emergency, sanitation, and utility service vehicles or workers, and wrecker operators under certain circumstances, subject to certain requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operation of Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H117 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316126Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback