FL S0114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Referred to Education; Rules
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the act as the "Dorothy L. Hukill Financial Literacy Act"; revising the requirements for the Next Generation Sunshine State Standards to include financial literacy; revising the required credits for a standard high school diploma to include one-half credit of instruction in personal financial literacy and money management and seven and one-half, rather than eight, credits in electives, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Graduation Requirements/Dorothy L. Hukill Financial Literacy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Education; Rules
2018-11-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H73 (Same As) 2019-01-03 - Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
S416 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback