FL S0112 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to allow the cap on homestead property assessments and the transfer of that cap to a new homestead to inure to the spouse, child, or grandchild of the property owner who inherits the property if the property becomes the homestead of the inheritor.
Title
Homestead Property Assessments/Cap [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Community Affairs | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00018 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1329 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council