FL S0110 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring specified information to be published on state agency websites in certain languages; requiring state agencies to disseminate certain advertisements to the public in languages other than English through specified media outlets in certain counties; requiring the Office of Economic and Demographic Research to publish certain information on its website, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Language Requirements for State Agency Websites and Advertisements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28631Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback