FL S0108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring the concealed weapons licensing program of the Division of Licensing of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to the Department of Law Enforcement by a type two transfer; creating the Concealed Weapons Licensing Program in the Department of Law Enforcement; redesignating the Department of Law Enforcement as the entity responsible for regulating, and collecting payments and fees from, concealed weapons licensing, etc.
Title
Regulation of Concealed Weapons Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 0601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 0625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 367 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/108 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/108/BillText/Filed/HTML |