FL S0108 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising eligibility for the purchase of credit for military service; declaring that the act fulfills an important state interest, etc.
Title
Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/21/15, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/108 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0108/BillText/Filed/HTML |