FL S0104 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a municipality to charge customers receiving its utility services in another municipality the same rates, fees, and charges as it charges consumers within its municipal boundaries under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Water and Sewer Utility Rates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08SenateDied in Rules
2024-02-08SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2024-02-08SenateNow in Rules
2024-02-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-02-06SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2024-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2024-01-30SenateNow in Community Affairs
2024-01-29SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2024-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-10-17SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2023-10-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H47 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H777 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
S1088 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1277 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S1510 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
180191Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/Amendment/564540/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/Analyses/2024s00104.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/Analyses/2024s00104.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/Analyses/2024s00104.pre.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/Analyses/2024s00104.ca.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/Vote/2024-01-29%200400PM~S00104%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/104/Vote/2024-02-06%200300PM~S00104%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback