FL S0100 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting certain persons and businesses from business taxes and fees; repealing provisions relating to exemptions allowed for disabled veterans of any war or their unremarried spouses; deleting fees for adding the word "Veteran" to an identification card or driver license; prohibiting tax collectors from charging certain driver license service fees to veterans who present specified forms of identification, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes and Fees for Veterans and Low-income Persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#867 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Chapter No. 2018-80
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (583351) 1015
2018-03-07SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-07HousePassed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2018-03-07HouseAmendment 354087 not allowed for consideration
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (583351) 1007
2018-03-06HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 603
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseReceived
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-05HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-28HouseIn Messages
2018-02-28SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 409
2018-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/27/18
2018-01-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-11SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/11/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-12-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 12/07/17, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-10-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-10-26SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 10/26/17, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H603 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 100
S910 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32214Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Amendment/746828/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Amendment/583351/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Amendment/550893/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Amendment/057269/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Amendment/354087/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Amendment/644860/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Amendment/928378/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Vote/SenateVote_s00100__004.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Vote/HouseVote_s00100__867.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/100/Vote/SenateVote_s00100__024.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback