FL S0100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain requirements for operating personal watercraft. Revises the requirements relating to the boating safety course required for leasing or renting a personal watercraft from a livery.
Title
Vessel Safety [EPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Nan Rich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Commerce; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00018; On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 401-S; Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Now in Commerce -SJ 00162 | |
2010-02-17 | Now in Commerce | |
2010-02-16 | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 401-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Commerce; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0233 (Similar To) 2010-03-17 - Unfavorable by General Government Policy Council, laid on Table; YEAS 6 NAYS 8 -HJ 00408
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0327 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0327 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |