FL S0098 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting prior authorization forms from requiring certain information; requiring health insurers and pharmacy benefits managers on behalf of health insurers to provide certain information relating to prior authorization by specified means; requiring health insurers to publish on their websites and provide to insureds in writing a procedure for insureds and health care providers to request protocol exceptions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurer Authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-01-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (450052)
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-11SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-11SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/11/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-13SenateNow in Rules
2017-12-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H199 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62742392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback