FL S0096 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the required health education in public schools to include information regarding the dangers and signs of human trafficking; authorizing a student to opt out of a specified portion of the health education under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking Education in Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-04SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-10SenateNow in Education
2017-10-09SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/09/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-09-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 09/12/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback