FL S0092 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 95
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the portions of the C-51 reservoir project for which the South Florida Water Management District may negotiate; revising water storage and use requirements specified for the project if state funds are appropriated for the project; specifying that Phase II of the project may be funded by appropriation, in addition to other sources, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

C-51 Reservoir Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 95
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 95
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-02-20SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/20/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-01-22SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/22/19, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2018-11-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H95 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-68

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3734598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback