FL S0092 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Management Services to prepare a plan regarding the centralized management of state-owned motor vehicles; requiring the department to conduct certain evaluations while developing the plan; providing an appropriation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-owned Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2016-12-16SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2016-12-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1540 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback